Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Weisel Jensen | 30.09.1996 | 11.11.1998 | direktion |
William Daniel Brüel | 01.10.1985 | 30.09.1996 | direktion |
Torsten Haug | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1994 | direktion |
Rolf Terje Olsen | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | direktion |
Torsten Haug | 01.10.1985 | 21.09.1989 | direktion |
Lars Bo Jørgensen | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1988 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bo Weisel Jensen | 30.09.1996 | 11.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Sven-Eric Håkan Halén | 30.09.1996 | 11.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Per Inge Jungkvist | 30.09.1996 | 11.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
Anders Folke Larsson | 29.03.1995 | 30.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Jan Erik Hernfrid Wangard | 29.03.1995 | 30.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Henrik Mogens Wedell-Wedellsborg | 01.10.1985 | 11.11.1998 | bestyrelse |
William Daniel Brüel | 01.10.1985 | 30.09.1996 | bestyrelse |
Sven Arne Blomberg | 01.10.1985 | 29.03.1995 | formand |
Torsten Haug | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1994 | bestyrelse |
Sven Krogstrup | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jens Vissing | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Peter Højland | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Anne Nielsen | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Leif Victorin | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | bestyrelse |
Johannes Norreby | 01.10.1985 | 15.04.1991 | formand |
Arne Bernroth | 01.10.1985 | 05.07.1990 | bestyrelse |
Karl Olof Hammarkvist | 01.10.1985 | 21.09.1989 | bestyrelse |
Lars Bo Jørgensen | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Jon Bjørstad | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Gudmund Rønningen | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Vidar Broder Lund | 01.10.1985 | 23.12.1988 | bestyrelse |
Carlos Federico Joly | 01.10.1985 | 17.03.1988 | bestyrelse |
Lars Peter Kruse | 01.10.1985 | 24.08.1987 | bestyrelse |
Vidar Broder Lund | 01.10.1985 | 24.08.1987 | bestyrelse |