Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jan Robert Christoffersen | 01.08.2009 | 23.01.2018 | direktion |
Carsten Petry | 08.03.2009 | 01.08.2009 | direktion |
Jan Robert Christoffersen | 01.04.2003 | 08.03.2009 | adm. dir |
Michael Dyrvig Lauritzen | 09.12.2002 | 30.03.2003 | adm. dir |
Jan Robert Christoffersen | 01.10.2001 | 09.12.2002 | adm. dir |
Michael Peter Gregers Nielsen | 16.05.2000 | 26.11.2002 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Philip Robert Grosmann Christoffersen | 27.10.2009 | 29.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Helle Engel Christoffersen | 01.08.2009 | 29.11.2017 | formand |
Allan Jensen Vestergaard | 02.11.2004 | 08.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Thøfner | 02.11.2004 | 08.03.2009 | bestyrelse |
Michael Mathiesen | 27.06.2003 | 27.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Helle Engel Christoffersen | 27.06.2003 | 02.11.2004 | bestyrelse |
Frank Ove Bjørklund | 15.05.2003 | 27.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jan Robert Christoffersen | 04.10.2001 | 29.11.2017 | bestyrelse |
Birgit Nørgaard | 06.08.2001 | 27.06.2003 | bestyrelse |
Jannick Birger Pedersen | 27.07.2001 | 06.08.2001 | bestyrelse |
Jan Ørting Hansen | 02.11.2000 | 04.10.2001 | bestyrelse |
Erik Lorenz Petersen | 02.11.2000 | 27.07.2001 | bestyrelse |
Michael Peter Gregers Nielsen | 16.05.2000 | 26.11.2002 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Elvang-Gøransson | 16.05.2000 | 02.11.2000 | bestyrelse |
Peter Vilsøe | 16.05.2000 | 02.11.2000 | formand |