Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Wærn | 30.12.2010 | 08.06.2021 | adm. dir |
Christel Arpalice Piron | 29.04.2003 | 30.12.2010 | adm. dir |
Carsten Wærn | 28.02.2002 | 29.04.2003 | adm. dir |
Clive Patrick Barcsai Hardcastle | 29.12.1999 | 28.02.2002 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.10.1999 | 29.12.1999 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Margit Wærn | 26.02.2014 | 14.09.2015 | formand |
Carsten Wærn | 30.12.2010 | 14.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Christel Arpalice Piron | 30.12.2010 | 26.02.2014 | formand |
Lars Uglebjerg Olsen | 30.12.2010 | 31.01.2013 | bestyrelse |